Owen, Brenda v. Coleman, Tim et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Marcell Owen
Defendant: Tim Coleman, Brian Charles Tarkenton, Ronald Osborne and Roger Lee Krueger, Jr
Case Number: 3:2018cv00968
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Exhibits (Letters from State Collection Service and TransUnion) to #1 Complaint, filed by Brenda Marcell Owen. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence from TransUnion, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Exhibit to (1 in 3:18-cv-00951-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01041-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01040-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00997-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01013-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00968-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00999-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01012-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01000-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00998-wmc) Complaints filed by Brenda Marcell Owen (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/04/2018. (rks),(ps)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brenda Marcell Owen. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form), #2 Cover Letter and Envelopes, #3 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner to submit $400 or Motion for IFP by 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/26/2018. (rks),(ps)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Marcell Owen. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen, Brenda v. Coleman, Tim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Charles Tarkenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Lee Krueger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Marcell Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?