Standard Process Inc. v. Feng, Charles et al

Plaintiff: Standard Process Inc.
Defendant: Charles Changhua Feng and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2018cv00996
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (Attachments: #1 Voluntary Dismissal) (jat)
January 23, 2019 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jat)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. (Maher, Ann)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Charles Changhua Feng served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Maher, Ann)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jat)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Notice by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Maher, Ann) Modified on 12/19/2018. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by 12/21/2018. (jat)
December 10, 2018 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark at their earliest convenience. (jat)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Charles Changhua Feng. (jat)
December 4, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
December 4, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. (Maher, Ann)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Changhua Feng, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2370112.), filed by Standard Process Inc., (Attachments: #1 Summons for Charles Changhua Feng, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Maher, Ann) Modified on 12/4/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Process Inc. v. Feng, Charles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Process Inc.
Represented By: Ann M. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Changhua Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?