Johnson, Antonio v. Boughton, Gary et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Da'mon Johnson
Defendant: Gary Boughton, S. Anderson, Jane Doe1, Rose Grochowski, Jolinda Waterman, Dr. Miller, Jane Doe 2, Sonya Anderson and John Doe
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2018cv01006
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
0 Judge: Barbara B Crabb
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Jane Doe1, Jane Doe 2, Miller, Sonya Anderson. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Rose Grochowski, Jolinda Waterman, Gary Boughton and John Doe. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/25/2019. (jef),(ps)
December 27, 2018 7 Warden PLRA Letter. (rks),(ps)
December 26, 2018 Partial Filing fee received : $ 8.23, receipt number 34690033510 (rks),(ps)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Antonio Da'mon Johnson assessed an initial partial filing fee of $8.23 due 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/12/2018. (nln),(ps)
December 12, 2018 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Antonio Da'mon Johnson. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2018: #1 IPP Calculation) (nln).
December 11, 2018 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Antonio Da'mon Johnson. (jef),(ps)
December 6, 2018 3 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (rks),(ps)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit $400 or Motion for IFP due 12/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/6/2018. (rks),(ps)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS, filed by Antonio Da'mon Johnson. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Certification as to Three or More Dismissals Under WIS. STAT. 801.02(7)(d)) (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, Antonio v. Boughton, Gary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boughton
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Grochowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolinda Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Da'mon Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?