Paape, Nathan et al v. Novak, Sue

Petitioner: Nathan Paape
Respondent: Sue Novak
Undetermined: CCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2018cv01028
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: William M Conley
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number 34690033502. (nln),(ps)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioner Nathan Paape to submit $5 fee or IFP motion along with Trust Fund Account Statement by 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/12/2018. (nln),(ps)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Brief in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Nathan Paape. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Correspondence re McMillian v. Leyman, et al., #2 Attachment B - Wisconsin State Journal article) (nln),(ps)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State, filed by Nathan Paape. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - WI Court of Appeals Decision filed 6/28/17 in 2015AP2462-CR, #2 Attachment 2 - WI Supreme Court Order entered 10/9/17 in 2015AP2462-CR, #3 Attachment 3 - Order Denying Motion for Post-Conviction Relief in Sheboygan County Circuit Court Case No. 12CF512, #4 Attachment 4 - WI Court of Appeals Decision entered 6/22/16 in 2014AP2876-CR, #5 Attachment 5 - Sentence Length and Reincarceration, #6 Attachment 6 - Statutory Assurance Violent Offender Incarceration Program-Tier 1, #7 Attachment 7 - Release of Lifer Cases After 1975, #8 Attachment 8 - WI State Public Defender Memo dated 1/28/13, #9 Attachment 9 - Mental Health Services Clinical Contact, #10 Attachment 10 - Mental Health Services Clinical Contact, #11 Attachment 11 - AL.com article dated 6/24/15, #12 Attachment 12 - Governor's Task Force on Sentencing and Corrections Final Report dated 12/17/1996, #13 Cover Letter, #14 Instruction Sheet) (nln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paape, Nathan et al v. Novak, Sue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Paape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sue Novak
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_habeas actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?