Owen, Brenda v. TransUnion Consumer Relations et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Marcell Owen
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services LLC, State Collection Agency, Experian National Consumer Assistance Center and TransUnion Consumer Relations
Case Number: 3:2018cv01041
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibits (Letters from State Collection Service and TransUnion) to #1 Complaint, filed by Brenda Marcell Owen. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence from TransUnion, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
December 17, 2018 Motion for In Forma Pauperis Screening. (rks),(ps)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/17/2018. (rks),(ps)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Exhibit to (1 in 3:18-cv-00951-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01041-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01040-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00997-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01013-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00968-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00999-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01012-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-01000-wmc) (1 in 3:18-cv-00998-wmc) Complaints filed by Brenda Marcell Owen (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Marcell Owen. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Case Search Results, #2 Envelope) (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen, Brenda v. TransUnion Consumer Relations et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Collection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian National Consumer Assistance Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion Consumer Relations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Marcell Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?