Hereford, Renette v. Catholic Charities, Inc., Diocese of Madison

Plaintiff: Renette Hereford
Defendant: Catholic Charities, Inc., Diocese of Madison
Case Number: 3:2018cv01049
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Catholic Charities, Inc., Diocese of Madison. (King, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Catholic Charities, Inc., Diocese of Madison. (King, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael James King for Defendant Catholic Charities, Inc., Diocese of Madison. (King, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Catholic Charities, Inc., Diocese of Madison. (lak)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Disregard. Modified on 1/15/2019. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
December 18, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Renette Hereford. (Canfield, Jason)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Catholic Charities, Inc., Diocese of Madison. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2377548.) Filed by Renette Hereford, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Canfield, Jason) Modified on 12/18/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hereford, Renette v. Catholic Charities, Inc., Diocese of Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renette Hereford
Represented By: Jason Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Charities, Inc., Diocese of Madison
Represented By: Michael James King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?