United States of America v. CNA Professional Services LLP
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: CNA Professional Services LLP
Case Number: 3:2018cv01050
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Notice by Plaintiff United States of America Concerning Time and Circumstances of Entry and Seizure. (Humphrey, Richard) Modified on 2/4/2019. (lak)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Application for Writ of Entry. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/18/2019. (voc)
December 18, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
December 18, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration of Walter Kurkiewicz filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: #1 Application for Writ of Entry. (Humphrey, Richard) Modified on 12/18/2018. (lak)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 Application for Writ of Entry, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Order for Entry on Premises to Effect Levy, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Humphrey, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. CNA Professional Services LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Professional Services LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?