Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Carolina Morales, Progressive Universal Insurance Company, Caroina Morales and Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv01060
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Acknowledgment of Service Executed on behalf of Involuntary Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Anderson, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Affidavit of Mailing. (Anderson, Jennifer) Modified on 1/29/2019. (lak)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Affidavit of Mailing. (Anderson, Jennifer) Modified on 1/29/2019. (lak)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Mailing. (Anderson, Jennifer) Modified on 1/22/2019. (lak)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Mailing. (Anderson, Jennifer) Modified on 1/22/2019. (lak)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Anderson, Jennifer)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carolina Morales, United States of America. (jat)
December 26, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
December 26, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2381000.), filed by Progressive Universal Insurance Company, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Anderson, Jennifer) (Main Document replaced and additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2018: #3 Letter dated June 21, 2018) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroina Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
Represented By: Jennifer L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?