Davidson, Vickey v. State Collection Services Inc.
Plaintiff: Vickey D. Davidson
Defendant: State Collection Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01064
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Service re: #11 Amended Answer by Defendant State Collection Services Inc. (Glazer, Saul),(ps) Modified on 2/20/2019. (lak)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Amended Answer to #1 Complaint by Defendant State Collection Services Inc. (Glazer, Saul),(ps)
January 31, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Plaintiff responsible for contacting the court at (608) 264-5153. Once plaintiff's call has been received, the court will then include counsel for defendant in the conference call. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln),(ps)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Service by Defendant State Collection Services Inc. as to #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Notice of Appearance, #9 Answer. (Glazer, Saul),(ps)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER by Defendant State Collection Services Inc. (Glazer, Saul),(ps)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant State Collection Services Inc. (Glazer, Saul),(ps)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Saul Coerver Glazer for Defendant State Collection Services Inc. (Glazer, Saul),(ps)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Marshal Service Return Executed. State Collection Services Inc. served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (rks),(ps)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to State Collection Services Inc. forwarded to US Marshals for service. (rks),(ps)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendant State Collection Services Inc. Service to be made by USMS. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 01/10/2019. (rks),(ps)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Vickey D. Davidson's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/26/2018. (nln),(ps)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Vickey D. Davidson. (nln),(ps)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Collection Services Inc., filed by Vickey D. Davidson. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 EEOC Determination Letter, EEOC Notice of Right to Sue) (nln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson, Vickey v. State Collection Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Collection Services Inc.
Represented By: Saul Coerver Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickey D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?