Hodgson, Micheal v. Wisconsin Central, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Micheal R. Hodgson
Defendant: Wisconsin Central, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00015
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas William Fuller for Plaintiff Micheal R. Hodgson. (Fuller, Thomas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Amended ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leneave, Cortney)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon McArthur Thompson for Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Thompson, Brandon)
February 4, 2019 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by James D. Helenhouse for Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Micheal R. Hodgson. (Leneave, Cortney)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Wisconsin Central, Ltd. served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Leneave, Cortney)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (jat)
January 8, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
January 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Central, Ltd., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2388016.), filed by Micheal R. Hodgson, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Leneave, Cortney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodgson, Micheal v. Wisconsin Central, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Central, Ltd.
Represented By: James D. Helenhouse
Represented By: Brandon McArthur Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal R. Hodgson
Represented By: Cortney S. Leneave
Represented By: Thomas William Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?