Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund et al v. ASTI Sawing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers District Council, Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund, Wisconsin Laborers - Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund and John J. Schmitt
Defendant: ASTI Sawing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00021
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant ASTI Sawing, Inc. (Bach, Daniel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed. ASTI Sawing, Inc. served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Ahrens, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs John J. Schmitt, Wisconsin Laborers - Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Wisconsin Laborers District Council, Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund. (Ahrens, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ASTI Sawing, Inc. (voc)
January 10, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
January 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASTI Sawing, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2389198.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ahrens, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund et al v. ASTI Sawing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers District Council
Represented By: Christopher J. Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund
Represented By: Christopher J. Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers - Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund
Represented By: Christopher J. Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship & Training Fund
Represented By: Christopher J. Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Christopher J. Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Schmitt
Represented By: Christopher J. Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTI Sawing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?