Searles, Trevor v. Bryden Motors Inc.

Plaintiff: Trevor Searles
Defendant: Bryden Motors Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00028
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/7/2019 [:10] (cak)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kraus, Kenneth)
February 20, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
February 6, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 2/21/2019. (kwf)
February 6, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Bryden Motors Inc. (Raynor, Agatha)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Agatha K. Raynor for Defendant Bryden Motors Inc. (Raynor, Agatha)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Bryden Motors Inc. (Raynor, Agatha)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Bryden Motors Inc. served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Kraus, Kenneth)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bryden Motors Inc. (kwf)
January 14, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
January 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Trevor Searles. (Kraus, Kenneth)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryden Motors Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391190.), filed by Trevor Searles, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discrimination Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Initial Determination - Probable Cause, #3 Exhibit C - Order of Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Right to Sue, #5 Exhibit E - E-mail dated September 4, 2018, #6 Exhibit F - Letter dated April 13, 2018, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons) (Kraus, Kenneth) Modified on 1/11/2019: Added exhibit descriptions. Detailed e-mail sent to counsel. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Searles, Trevor v. Bryden Motors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryden Motors Inc.
Represented By: Agatha K. Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Searles
Represented By: Kenneth Emanuel Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?