Foulk, Helen v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Helen Foulk
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00030
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: William M Conley
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #12 Motion to Admit Rita Ann Maimbourg Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/15/2019. (lak)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to Admit Rita Ann Maimbourg Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2409354.) by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Maimbourg, Rita)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Motion to Admit Jennifer Lynn Steinmetz Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/14/2019. (lak)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Admit Jennifer Lynn Steinmetz Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2408824.) by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
February 13, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 3/5/2019. (kwf)
February 13, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Ethicon, Inc. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Ethicon, Inc. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Tracy J. Van Steenburgh Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/12/2019. (lak)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Tracy J. Van Steenburgh Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2407762.) by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Van Steenburgh, Tracy)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandie L. Morgenroth for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Morgenroth, Brandie) Modified on 2/12/2019. (lak)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, Inc.) (kwf)
January 14, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
January 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391241.), filed by Helen Foulk. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Ethicon, Inc., #2 Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dunken, Bert) Modified on 1/14/2019: Johnson & Johnson or Johnson & Johnson Inc.? Summonses are missing the case number. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foulk, Helen v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Steinmetz
Represented By: Tracy J Van Steenburgh
Represented By: Brandie L. Morgenroth
Represented By: Rita Ann Maimbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Steinmetz
Represented By: Tracy J Van Steenburgh
Represented By: Brandie L. Morgenroth
Represented By: Rita Ann Maimbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Foulk
Represented By: Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?