Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund et al v. JB Johnson Brothers, LLC

Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Industry Advancement Program Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund and John J. Schmitt
Defendant: JB Johnson Brothers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00049
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
1 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (kwf)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs John J. Schmitt, Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Industry Advancement Program Fund, Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund. (Thompson, Philip)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 2/8/2019. (lak)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JB Johnson Brothers, LLC. (kwf)
January 18, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
January 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JB Johnson Brothers, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2394627.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Summons (Without Case Number), #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 1/18/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund et al v. JB Johnson Brothers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Johnson Brothers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Industry Advancement Program Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship & Training Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Schmitt
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?