Sullivan, Stacy et al v. Town of Stockholm et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Sullivan, Birchwood Acres, LLC and Michael Sullivan
Defendant: Jane Whiteside, ABC Insurance Company, Town of Stockholm and DEF Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00053
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Birchwood Acres, LLC, Michael Sullivan, Stacy Sullivan re: #11 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jane Whiteside. (Morgenroth, Brandie)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendant Jane Whiteside has filed a motion (dkt. #14 ) to stay discovery and Rule 26 proceedings until the court decides her motion to dismiss (dkt. #11 ), which will be under advisal to the court on March 22, 2019. Such requests are common in this circumstance and the court will provide its usual response: the March 28, 2019 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference remains on the schedule and the parties, including defendant Whiteside, are responsible for submitting a timely Rule 26(f) report. Discovery cannot begin for any party until the conclusion of the March 28 conference, so there is no need to stay discovery between now and then. At the conference, the court will discuss with all parties how the court should handle defendant Whiteside's motion to stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/27/2019. (jls)
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 Affidavit of William J. Mavity filed by Defendant Jane Whiteside re: #14 Motion to Stay, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - E-mail dated February 2, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - E-mail dated February 23, 2019) (lak)
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 Affidavit of Jane Whiteside filed by Defendant Jane Whiteside re: #14 Motion to Stay, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated February 18, 2019, #2 Exhibit B - E-mail dated February 23, 2019) (lak)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 Disregard. See #18 . Modified on 2/27/2019. (lak)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 Disregard. See #17 . Modified on 2/27/2019. (lak)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to Stay by Defendant Jane Whiteside. Response due 3/6/2019. (Mavity, William)
February 26, 2019 Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants Town of Stockholm, Jane Whiteside. (Morris, Fred)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 Brief in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Jane Whiteside. (Mavity, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Jane Whiteside. Brief in Opposition due 3/12/2019. Brief in Reply due 3/22/2019. (Mavity, William)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Town of Stockholm answer due 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/15/2019. (jls)
February 14, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Town of Stockholm. (Jacobs, Jerilyn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian Braziel for Defendants Town of Stockholm, Jane Whiteside. (Braziel, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Fred L. Morris for Defendant Town of Stockholm. (Morris, Fred)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Jerilyn Jacobs for Defendant Town of Stockholm. (Jacobs, Jerilyn)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Scott M. Rusert Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/23/2019. (lak)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Scott M. Rusert Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2397269.) by Plaintiffs Birchwood Acres, LLC, Michael Sullivan, Stacy Sullivan. (Rusert, Scott)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Disregard. Modified on 1/23/2019. (lak)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ABC Insurance Company, DEF Insurance Company, Town of Stockholm, and Jane Whiteside. (jls)
January 22, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
January 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2395304.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morgenroth, Brandie) Modified on 1/22/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan, Stacy et al v. Town of Stockholm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Whiteside
Represented By: William James Mavity
Represented By: Brian Braziel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Stockholm
Represented By: Fred L. Morris
Represented By: Brian Braziel
Represented By: Jerilyn Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Sullivan
Represented By: Brandie L. Morgenroth
Represented By: Scott M. Rusert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birchwood Acres, LLC
Represented By: Brandie L. Morgenroth
Represented By: Scott M. Rusert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Brandie L. Morgenroth
Represented By: Scott M. Rusert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?