Carter, Jackie v. McArdle, Sandra et al
Plaintiff: Jackie Carter
Defendant: Sandra McArdle and Jolinda Waterman
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00057
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Sandra McArdle. Summons forwarded to USMS for service. (nln),(ps)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing USMS to Serve Complaint on Defendant Sandra McArdle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/22/2019. (nln),(ps)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendant Jolinda Waterman. Service not accepted on behalf of Sandra McArdle. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel Lee Bachhuber for Defendant Jolinda Waterman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Jolinda Waterman, Sandra McArdle. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. On or before April 8, 2019, defendants are directed to file a response to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (dkt. #2 ). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/18/2019. (rks),(ps)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk's Office in response to dkt. #8 . (rks),(ps)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Jackie Carter regarding filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Disbursement Requests, #2 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps)
February 25, 2019 ***Case Reopened. $2.83 initial partial filing fee received on 2/25/19. (nln),(ps)
February 25, 2019 Partial Filing fee received in a closed case: $2.83, receipt number 34690033933. (nln),(ps)
February 25, 2019 Civil case terminated for plaintiff's failure to pay initial partial filing fee. No fee is owed for filing this case. (nln),(ps)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $2.83 assessed due 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/25/2019. (rks),(ps)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jackie Carter. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef).
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (rks),(ps)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jackie Carter. (rks),(ps)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and protective order (and permanent relief) by Plaintiff Jackie Carter. (rks),(ps)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jackie Carter. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (rks)
January 22, 2019 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. Case no longer assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter, Jackie v. McArdle, Sandra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra McArdle
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolinda Waterman
Represented By: Rachel Lee Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?