Dickson, James v. Adams Outdoor Advertising
Plaintiff: James P. Dickson
Defendant: Adams Outdoor Advertising
Case Number: 3:2019cv00066
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/21/2019 [:10] (cak)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Discovery Plan, Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Barker, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Adams Outdoor Advertising. (Barker, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER by Defendant Adams Outdoor Advertising. (Barker, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Adams Outdoor Advertising served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Gingras, Robert)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adams Outdoor Advertising. (jat)
January 24, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
January 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adams Outdoor Advertising, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2398301.), filed by James P. Dickson, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Gingras, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickson, James v. Adams Outdoor Advertising
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Dickson
Represented By: Robert John Gingras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Outdoor Advertising
Represented By: Daniel Desmond Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?