Painters Local 802 Pension Fund et al v. Surf Prep Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeff Mehrhoff, Painters Local 802 Pension Fund, Painters Local 802 Health Fund and Painters Local 802 Apprenticeship Fund
Defendant: Surf Prep Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00077
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 5/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due 9/30/2019. Settlement Letters due 4/10/2020. Motions in Limine due 4/17/2020. Response to Motion due 5/1/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 5/18/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/25/2019. (jls)
March 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/21/2019 [:10] (cak)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ho, Yingtao)
February 20, 2019 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert S. Driscoll for Defendant Surf Prep Inc. (Driscoll, Robert)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher Kevin Schuele for Defendant Surf Prep Inc. (Schuele, Christopher)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Surf Prep Inc. (Zawadsky, John)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant Surf Prep Inc. (Zawadsky, John)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by John H. Zawadsky for Defendant Surf Prep Inc. (Zawadsky, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed. Surf Prep Inc. served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Ho, Yingtao)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Surf Prep Inc. (arw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Jeff Mehrhoff, Painters Local 802 Apprenticeship Fund, Painters Local 802 Health Fund, Painters Local 802 Pension Fund. (Ho, Yingtao)
February 4, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
February 4, 2019 Case directly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. See related case 18-cv-590-jdp. (arw)
February 4, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
February 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Surf Prep Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2402171) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Ho, Yingtao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Painters Local 802 Pension Fund et al v. Surf Prep Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Mehrhoff
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters Local 802 Pension Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters Local 802 Health Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters Local 802 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surf Prep Inc.
Represented By: John H. Zawadsky
Represented By: Robert S. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher Kevin Schuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?