Bergquist, Donn v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Donn Bergquist
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00104
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 5/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due 12/31/2019. Settlement Letters due 4/24/2020. Motions in Limine due 5/8/2020. Response to Motion due 5/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/5/2019. (jls)
April 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/5/2019 [:10] (cak)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ayers, Bradley)
April 1, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 01:00 PM rescheduled to 02:00 PM the same date to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for the Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is satisfied that the parties' stipulation, Dkt. #6 , contains sufficient information to establish complete diversity of citizenship, in compliance with the court's March 13, 2019 order, Dkt. #5 . Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/27/2019. (jls)
March 25, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 Proof of Diversity of Citizenship by Plaintiff Donn Bergquist. (Beckmann, Edward)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity of Citizenship due 3/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/12/2019. (jls)
March 5, 2019 Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 01:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Ayers, Bradley)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Ayers, Bradley)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (jls)
February 8, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
February 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2405780.), filed by Donn Bergquist, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Beckmann, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergquist, Donn v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donn Bergquist
Represented By: Edward E. Beckmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley J Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?