Moore, Brian v. Berryhill, Nancy

Plaintiff: Brian T. Moore
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv00110
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, (Attachments: #1 Service Receipt - Commissioner) (Daley, Frederick)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, (Attachments: #1 Service Receipt - U.S. Attorney General) (Daley, Frederick)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Service Receipt - U.S. Attorney) (Daley, Frederick)
April 3, 2019 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (kwf)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Materials returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kwf)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/12/2019. (kwf)
February 12, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
February 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (kwf)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Meredith Emily Marcus for Plaintiff Brian T. Moore. (Marcus, Meredith)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick J. Daley, Jr. for Plaintiff Brian T. Moore. (Daley, Frederick)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brian T. Moore, (Attachments: #1 USM-285 - Commissioner, #2 USM-285 - Attorney General, #3 USM-285 - U.S. Attorney) (Daley, Frederick) Modified on 2/12/2019. (lak)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Brian T. Moore, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses Combined) (Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore, Brian v. Berryhill, Nancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian T. Moore
Represented By: Meredith Emily Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?