Mohelski, Camy v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.

Plaintiff: Camy Mohelski
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00129
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (kwf)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Camy Mohelski. (Balmer, James)
February 22, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
February 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2411139.), filed by Camy Mohelski (Balmer, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) Complaint is missing case number.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohelski, Camy v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camy Mohelski
Represented By: James Walter Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?