Fischer, Teresa et al v. Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Fischer and David Fischer
Defendant: Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company and ABC Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00156
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company. Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Tutwiler, Amy) Modified on 4/2/2019. (lak)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Defendant Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company. (jat)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10-30-17 Email, #2 Amended Summons - Sentry Insurance) (Tutwiler, Amy) Modified on 2/28/2019. (lak)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company. (jat)
February 27, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
February 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2416474.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 11-6-17 Email, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Sentry Insurance) (Tutwiler, Amy) Modified on 2/27/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer, Teresa et al v. Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Fischer
Represented By: Patricia J. Epstein Putney
Represented By: Storm Larson
Represented By: Amy B. F. Tutwiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fischer
Represented By: Patricia J. Epstein Putney
Represented By: Storm Larson
Represented By: Amy B. F. Tutwiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?