Pops, Edwin et al v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edwin Pops and Darren Clay
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00157
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Walmart, Inc. Walmart, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Farrell, Andrea)
March 1, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
March 1, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Darren Clay, Edwin Pops. (Farrell, Andrea)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart, Inc. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2416686) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Farrell, Andrea) Modified on 2/27/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pops, Edwin et al v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Pops
Represented By: Andrea Joyce Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Clay
Represented By: Andrea Joyce Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?