Tetting, Laura v. State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs

Plaintiff: Laura A. Tetting
Defendant: State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2019cv00168
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs answer due 5/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/29/2019. (kwf)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Carson, Gesina)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Gesina S. Carson for Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs. (Carson, Gesina)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Anne Maryse Bensky for Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs. (Bensky, Anne)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs. State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Fairweather, Nicholas)
March 4, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
March 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2418546) Filed by Laura A. Tetting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fairweather, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tetting, Laura v. State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura A. Tetting
Represented By: Hayley I. Archer
Represented By: Nicholas E. Fairweather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Gesina S. Carson
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?