Doe, Jane v. University of Wisconsin - Madison
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: University of Wisconsin - Madison
Case Number: 3:2019cv00169
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Anne Maryse Bensky for Defendant University of Wisconsin - Madison. (Bensky, Anne)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffery Allan Simcox for Defendant University of Wisconsin - Madison. (Simcox, Jeffery)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant University of Wisconsin - Madison. University of Wisconsin - Madison waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Kinne, Paul)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to University of Wisconsin - Madison. (kwf)
March 6, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
March 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of Wisconsin - Madison, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2418874.), filed by Jane Doe, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Kinne, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe, Jane v. University of Wisconsin - Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Paul A. Kinne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Wisconsin - Madison
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Represented By: Jeffery Allan Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?