Pak v Dept of Veterans Affairs

Plaintiff: Jae Pak
Defendant: Dept of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2019cv00275
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jef),(ps)
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00404. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Jae Pak. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the Clerk for the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 4/8/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lns) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Dept of Veterans Affairs. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer by Plaintiff Jae Pak. (sct) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Plaintiff is to file a response to #12 Dft's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by 3/18/2019. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plaintiff is to appear in person. #14 Dft's Motion to Stay Discovery and Continue Pretrial Conference is deemed moot. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE by Defendant Dept of Veterans Affairs. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT DUE TO IMPROPER VENUE OR ALTERNATIVELY TO TRANSFER filed by Dept of Veterans Affairs. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT DUE TO IMPROPER VENUE OR ALTERNATIVELY TO TRANSFER by Defendant Dept of Veterans Affairs. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Dept of Veterans Affairs (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USMS obo Jae Pak as to Dept of Veterans Affairs. (sct) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Jae Pak. US Attorney General served on 1/9/2019. (sct) Modified on 2/8/2019 to correct text. (sct). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Jae Pak. Assistant US Attorney served on 12/31/2018, answer due 3/1/2019. (sct) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only, per chambers. (cc: USMS) (lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dept of Veterans Affairs. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: USMS) (lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTS #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 12/7/2018. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jae Pak. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285)(sct) Modified on 12/6/2018 to correct party(sct). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms against Dept of Veterans Affairs, filed by Jae Pak.(sct) Modified on 12/7/2018 to correct party (sct). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 4/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pak v Dept of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jae Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?