Grant, James v. Twing, Jeff
Plaintiff: James Edward Grant
Defendant: Jeff Twing
Case Number: 3:2019cv00335
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk's Office in response to #8 letter from plaintiff. (jef),(ps)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Letter requesting a copy of May 20, 2019 submission by Plaintiff James Edward Grant. (Attachments: #1 Order of protection, incident report, police call history, release conditions, property log sheet, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff's second motion for reconsideration of the May 2, 2019 order dismissing his case, Dkt. #8 , is DENIED. Any further motion for reconsideration Grant files will be deemed denied after seven days unless the court orders otherwise. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/21/2019. (jef),(ps)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff James Edward Grant. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2019: #1 Notice of complaint, #2 Notice of claim, #3 Exhibits - 5/7/19 date stamped page, affidavit of no service, letter) (jef).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the May 2, 2019 order dismissing his case, Dkt. #6 , is DENIED. Nothing in plaintiff's motion addresses my conclusion that his case is barred by the sanctions against him. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/10/2019. (jef),(ps)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Reconsideration re #4 Dismissal Order by Plaintiff James Edward Grant. (Attachments: #1 Letters, #2 Motions, dkts. #1 , #2 , #3 ) (jef),(ps)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant dismissing this case. (jef),(ps)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that this case is DISMISSED. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment for defendant and close this case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/2/2019. (jef),(ps)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Notice of Claim by Plaintiff James Edward Grant. (jef),(ps)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Notice of Complaint by Plaintiff James Edward Grant. (jef)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 Motion for New Complaint / COMPLAINT against Jeff Twing, filed by James Edward Grant. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (jef/jcf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant, James v. Twing, Jeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Twing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?