In re Spectrum Brands Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund and The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System
Defendant: Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, HRG Group, Inc. and Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00347
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (61 in case 3:19-cv-00178-jdp, 35 3:19-cv-00347-jdp) Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/25/2019. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (voc) Modified on 1/10/2020. (lak)
January 10, 2020 Filing 35 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report by Defendants HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Luther, Jennifer)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties have submitted a letter notifying the court that they have agreed to mediate these cases in March 2020, and they ask the court to defer a decision on the pending motions to dismiss (46 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp, 20 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp). Because the mediation could resolve both cases, the court DENIES without prejudice the motions to dismiss. No later than April 1, 2020, the parties should file a report with the court that includes the following information: (1) the status of the mediation; (2) whether defendants wish to renew their motions to dismiss; and (3) any other steps either side believes that the court should take. If the parties do not respond by April 1, the court will construe the parties' silence to mean that they have settled the cases and the court will enter a standard order of dismissal. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/7/2020. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00178-jdp, 3:19-cv-00347-jdp. (arw)
January 7, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Agreement to Mediate and Request to Defer Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by Defendants HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp (Luther, Jennifer) Modified on 1/7/2020. (arw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Luther for Defendants HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Luther, Jennifer)
November 6, 2019 Filing 31 Declaration of Richard A. Rosen filed by Defendants HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc. re: (20 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 46 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp) Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Form 10-Q) Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Lee, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 30 Brief in Reply by Defendants HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc. in Support of (20 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 46 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp) Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Lee, Matthew) Modified on 11/7/2019. (lak)
October 25, 2019 Reset Briefing Deadlines re: (20 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 46 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp) Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Brief in Reply due 11/6/2019. (arw)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (28 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 54 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Reply due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/25/2019. (arw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Rosen, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of Katherine M. Sinderson filed by Plaintiff The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System re: (20 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 46 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp) Motion to Dismiss, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summary Chart of Statements Defendants Claim are Forward-Looking, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chart of Spectrum's Form 10-K Risk Factors Cited by Defendants, #3 Exhibit 3 - In re HealthSouth Corp. Sec. Litig. - Order denying Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion) Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Sinderson, Katherine) Modified on 10/11/2019. (lak).
October 10, 2019 Filing 26 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System re: (20 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 46 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp) Motion to Dismiss, filed by Douglas L. Martin, Andreas R. Rouve, HRG Group, Inc., David M. Maura, Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc. [Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint.] Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Sinderson, Katherine)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Alison E. Stites re: Plaintiffs The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System, West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund, Earl S. Wagner. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Poland, Douglas) Modified on 9/16/2019. (kwf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas Maynard Poland for Lead Plaintiffs The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Poland, Douglas) Modified on 9/16/2019. (kwf)
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Kevin Michael LeRoy re: Defendants Douglas L. Martin, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00178-jdp, 3:19-cv-00347-jdp (LeRoy, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to (20 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 46 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp) Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Brief in Opposition due 10/10/2019. Brief in Reply due 10/30/2019. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (kwf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 Declaration of Richard A. Rosen filed by Defendants HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc. re: (20 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 46 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp) Motion to Dismiss, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summary Chart of Alleged Misstatements, #2 Exhibit 2 - March 7, 2019 Shareholder Alert, #3 Exhibit 3 - March 27, 2019 Shareholder Alert, #4 Exhibit 4 - April 30, 2019 Shareholder Alert, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2016.07.28 Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Q3 2016 Earnings Call, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2016.11.17 Spectrum Brands Holdings 10-K, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2017.01.26 Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Q1 2017 Earnings Call, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2017.03.07 Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc. Company Conference Call, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2017.05.02 Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Q2 2017 Earnings Call, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2017.05.02 SPB_Q2_2017 Earnings Call Presentation_Final, #11 Exhibit 11 - 2017.07.27 Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Q3 2017 Earnings Call, #12 Exhibit 12 - 2017.11.16 Spectrum Brands Holdings 10-K, #13 Exhibit 13 - 2017.11.16 Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Q4 2017 Earnings Call, #14 Exhibit 14 - 2018.02.08 Spectrum Brands Holdings 8-K, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2018.02.08 Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Q1 2018 Earnings Call, #16 Exhibit 16 - 2018.04.26 Spectrum Brands Holdings 8-K, #17 Exhibit 17 - 2018.04.26 Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Q2 2018 Earnings Call, #18 Exhibit 18 - Spectrum Brands Holdings Joint Proxy & Registration Statement, #19 Exhibit 19 - 2018.05.03 Spectrum Brands Holdings 10-Q, #20 Exhibit 20 - 2018.07.26 Spectrum Brands Holdings 8-K, #21 Exhibit 21 - 2018.07.26 Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Q3 2018 Earnings Call, #22 Exhibit 22 - 2018.11.19 Spectrum Brands Holdings Inc Q4 2018 Earnings Call Transcript, #23 Exhibit 23 - Motion, #24 Exhibit 24 - Memorandum, #25 Exhibit 25 - Declaration, #26 Exhibit 26 - Joint Declaration) Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp (Lee, Matthew) Modified on 8/27/2019. (lak)
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 Brief in Support of (20 in 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 46 in 3:19-cv-00178-jdp) Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendants HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Lee, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendants HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., HRG Group, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc. Response due 9/3/2019. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp (Lee, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 Disregard. See #20 . Modified on 8/27/2019. (lak)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 Stipulation for Service of The Amended Class Action Complaint and Schedule for Responses Thereto by Plaintiff The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Sinderson, Katherine)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Pretrial Conference Order: # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint due 8/26/2019. Response due 10/10/2019. Reply due 10/30/2019. Motion to Certify Class due 6/5/2020. Dispositive Motions due 4/2/2021. Settlement Letters due 8/20/2021. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 8/27/2021. Objections due 9/10/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2021 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/4/2021 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/14/2019. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (arw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Sinderson, Katherine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew William Traylor for Plaintiff The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp. (Traylor, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve, Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., and HRG Group, Inc., filed by The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System, (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Certification Pursuant to The Federal Securities Laws, #2 Appendix B - Chart, #3 Appendix C - Chart) (Sinderson, Katherine) Modified on 7/15/2019. (lak) Modified on 7/16/2019. (kwf)
July 2, 2019 Reset Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset at the request of counsel for 8/14/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp (jls)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties have submitted a stipulated schedule that calls for an amended complaint by July 12, 2019, followed by defendants' answer or motion to dismiss on August 26, 2019, with briefing completed by October 30, 2019. The parties also have requested that the court amend the caption to read "In re Spectrum Brands Securities Litigation" and that all papers be filed only in Case No. 19-cv-347. Starting at the end, the Clerk of Court is directed to change the case caption as requested, and the parties are directed to file their submissions only in Case No. 19-cv-347. Next, the court accepts and enters the stipulated dates, with the understanding that the briefing schedule is generous enough to defy extensions. Finally, the court is not going to let the rest of the schedule float until it decides the motion to dismiss. Not later than July 26, 2019, the parties are to submit their Rule 26(f) report to the court with their proposal(s) for a complete schedule that goes live at the beginning of January, 2020 (i.e., two months after the dismissal reply brief is filed) and is based on this court's scheduling template for class actions (~6 months for Rule 23 motions, ~ 12 months for Rule 56 motions, ~ 18 months to trial). The court will hold a telephonic preliminary pretrial conference on August 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. at which it will set the schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/21/2019. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00178-jdp, 3:19-cv-00347-jdp. (kwf)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated Motion to Enter Scheduling Order for Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleadings by Plaintiff The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System. Response due 6/27/2019. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp (Sinderson, Katherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Julia Karen Tebor for Plaintiff The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp (Tebor, Julia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Jai Kamal Chandrasekhar for Plaintiff The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp (Chandrasekhar, Jai)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Katherine McCracken Sinderson for Plaintiff The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00347-jdp, 3:19-cv-00178-jdp (Sinderson, Katherine)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION and ORDER granting #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Selection of Counsel; consolidating Case Nos. 19-cv-178-jdp and 19-cv-347-jdp for all purposes; approving The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System to serve as lead plaintiffs; approving lead plaintiffs' choice of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP as lead counsel and the law firm Rathje Woodward LLC as liaison counsel. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/12/2019. (kwf)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Second Brief in Support of #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Selection of Counsel by Movant The Public School Teachers' Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago and The Cambridge Retirement System. (Stites, Alison) Modified on 5/14/2019. (lak)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Declaration of Charles A. Burbridge and Francis E. Murphy, III filed by Movant The Public School Teachers' Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago and The Cambridge Retirement System re: #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Modified on 5/7/2019. (lak)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Douglas M. Poland filed by Movant The Public School Teachers' Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago and The Cambridge Retirement System re: #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certifications, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #3 Exhibit C - See #6 ., #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Pendency of Wagner Action, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Pendency of West Palm Beach Action, #6 Exhibit F - Bernstein Litowitz Resume) (Stites, Alison) Modified on 5/7/2019. (lak)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Selection of Counsel by Movant The Public School Teachers' Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago and The Cambridge Retirement System. (Stites, Alison) Modified on 5/7/2019. (lak)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Selection of Counsel by Movant The Public School Teachers' Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago and The Cambridge Retirement System. Response due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Stites, Alison) Modified on 5/7/2019. (lak)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc., Douglas L. Martin, David M. Maura, Andreas R. Rouve. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Douglas Martin, #2 Summons - David Maura, #3 Summons - Andreas Rove) (arw)
May 1, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
May 1, 2019 Case directly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws - Class Action against All Defendant, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2455744.), filed by West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Spectrum Brands, #4 Summons - Douglas L. Martin, #5 Summons - David M. Maura, #6 Summons - Andreas R. Rouve) (Stites, Alison) Modified on 5/1/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Spectrum Brands Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreas R. Rouve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Brands Legacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Maura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRG Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund
Represented By: Alison E Stites
Represented By: Douglas Maynard Poland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and the Cambridge Retirement System
Represented By: Alison E Stites
Represented By: Katherine McCracken Sinderson
Represented By: Julia Karen Tebor
Represented By: Jai Kamal Chandrasekhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?