Parker, Linda et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: United Healthcare of Wisconsin, Inc., State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, HealthPartners Insurance Company and Linda G. Parker
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Stipan Ascic, Transource Logistics, Inc., Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. and United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00374
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc., HealthPartners Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stipan Ascic, Transource Logistics, Inc., and United Healthcare Services, Inc. (jls)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Linda G. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (Nicolet, Russell)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is satisfied that plaintiff Linda Parker's amended complaint, Dkt. #4 , contains allegations sufficient to establish subject matter jurisdiction in compliance with the court's May 30, 2019 order, Dkt. #3 . Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/13/2019. (jls)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc., HealthPartners Insurance Company, Progressive Advanced Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stipan Ascic, Transource Logistics, Inc., United Healthcare of Wisconsin, Inc., filed by Linda G. Parker, (Attachments: #1 Disregard.) (Nicolet, Russell) Modified on 6/12/2019: Updated parties. (lak)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity of Citizenship due 6/13/2019. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/30/19. (jat)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint filed by Linda G. Parker. JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet. (Nicolet, Russell)
May 22, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
May 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2470766.), filed by Linda G. Parker. (Nicolet, Russell) Modified on 5/22/2019: E-mail sent to counsel requesting the Civil Cover Sheet be filed. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker, Linda et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stipan Ascic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transource Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare of Wisconsin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HealthPartners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda G. Parker
Represented By: Russell Dale Nicolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?