Reno, Jennifer v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jennifer Reno
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00387
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 Letter Stating No Reply to be Filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Reno re: #6 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Jennifer Reno. (Mayer, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 Affidavit of John F. Mayer filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Reno re: #12 Motion to Bifurcate, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Xiong v. State Farm Case, #2 Exhibit B - Fiserev v. Westchester Case, #3 Exhibit C - Eide v. Life Insurance Company Case, #4 Exhibit D - Beigl v. Transamerica Life Insurance Case, #5 Exhibit E - Ingram v. State Farm Case) (Mayer, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Jennifer Reno re: #12 Motion to Bifurcate filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Mayer, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 Brief in Support of #12 Motion to Bifurcate Claims and Stay Discovery by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Barbara)
July 3, 2019 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines re: #12 Motion to Bifurcate Claims and Stay Discovery by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Response due 7/12/2019. (arw/slc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Disregard. See #14 . Modified on 7/8/2019. (lak)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to Bifurcate Claims and Stay Discovery by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Response due 7/10/2019. (O'Brien, Barbara)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 8/9/2019. Dispositive Motions due 4/17/2020. Settlement Letters due 8/7/2020. Motions in Limine due 8/14/2020. Response to Motion due 8/28/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/27/19. (jat)
June 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/27/2019 [:10] (cak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of David Culp filed by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company re: #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. (O'Brien, Barbara)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company re: #6 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Jennifer Reno. (O'Brien, Barbara)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Jennifer Reno (Mayer, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in Support of #6 Motion to Remand to State Court as There is No Diversity Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Jennifer Reno. (Mayer, John) Modified on 6/14/2019. (lak)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO REMAND to State Court as There is No Diversity Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Jennifer Reno. Brief in Opposition due 7/5/2019. Brief in Reply due 7/15/2019. (Mayer, John) Modified on 6/14/2019. (lak)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Disregard, to be refiled as a motion. (Mayer, John) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jat).
May 21, 2019 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Barbara)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Barbara)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Record from Dane County Circuit Court, Case Number 19CV1018. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Summons and Complaint, #3 Notice of Retainer, #4 Affidavit of Service, #5 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal) (arw)
May 16, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
May 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 19cv1018 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2464898) filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint) (O'Brien, Barbara) Modified on 5/14/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reno, Jennifer v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Reno
Represented By: John Mayer
Represented By: John Francis Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Barbara A. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?