CURT Manufacturing, LLC v. Fikany, Michael et al

Plaintiff: CURT Manufacturing, LLC
Defendant: Michael Fikany and John Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2019cv00389
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (kwf)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff CURT Manufacturing, LLC. (Maher, Ann)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Michael Fikany served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Maher, Ann)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Fikany. (kwf)
May 15, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
May 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Reid Howe for Plaintiff CURT Manufacturing, LLC. (Howe, Stephen) Modified on 5/14/2019. (lak)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff CURT Manufacturing, LLC. (Maher, Ann)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2465172.), filed by CURT Manufacturing, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Maher, Ann) Modified on 5/14/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CURT Manufacturing, LLC v. Fikany, Michael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fikany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURT Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Ann M. Maher
Represented By: Stephen Reid Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?