Tolksdorf, Lori v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Lori Tolksdorf
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00395
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Keenan Ryan for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Ryan, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 7/19/2019. (jat)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #7 Stipulation for Enlargement of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/21/19. (jat)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulation for Enlargement of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanus, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanus, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Keenan Ryan for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Ryan, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by David John Hanus for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanus, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Parsons, William)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (jat)
May 16, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
May 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2466268.), filed by Lori Tolksdorf, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Parsons, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolksdorf, Lori v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Tolksdorf
Represented By: William Ernest Parsons
Represented By: Timothy Peter Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: David John Hanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?