Linsmeyer, Jason v. Tegels, Lizzie
Petitioner: Jason S. Linsmeyer
Respondent: Lizzie Tegels
Case Number: 3:2019cv00396
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34690034536. (jef),(ps)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Service by Petitioner Jason S. Linsmeyer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk's Office returning file stamped copy of petition. (rks),(ps)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Jason S. Linsmeyer. (rks),(ps)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State, filed by Jason S. Linsmeyer. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Wisconsin Court of Appeals Remittitur dated 2/14/2018, #2 Wisconsin Court of Appeals Opinion and Order dated 10/25/2017, #3 Supreme Court of Wisconsin Order dated 2/13/2018, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Envelope) (rks),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linsmeyer, Jason v. Tegels, Lizzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lizzie Tegels
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_habeas actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason S. Linsmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?