Robert, Dashawn v. Visions Night Club et al
Plaintiff: Dashawn M. Robert
Defendant: City of Madison, David Brown, Tom Reichenberger, Mayor Satya Rhodes-Conway and Visions Night Club
Case Number: 3:2019cv00401
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Dashawn Robert's request for leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, dkt. #2 , is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/14/2019. (nln),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Dashawn M. Robert. (Attachments: #1 Copy of return mail, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiff Dashawn Robert indicating he has not received financial affidavit due to complications with mailing process, requesting extension of time to submit financial affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Mail Returned and financial affidavit. Mail re-sent to Dashawn Robert using the same address but adding c/o of Melvin Howse. (jef),(ps)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Mail returned as undeliverable re financial affidavit mailed to plaintiff Dashawn M. Robert on 5/23/19 at 2800 W. Wright Street address. Re-sent financial affidavit to plaintiff at 2800 W. Wright Street address and included Apt #208. (nln),(ps)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Dashawn M. Robert. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope) (nln),(ps)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Inmate Trust Fund Account Statement due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/16/2019. (rks),(ps)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dashawn M. Robert. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dashawn M. Robert. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope) (rks),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert, Dashawn v. Visions Night Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Reichenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Satya Rhodes-Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visions Night Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dashawn M. Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?