Tenaha Licensing LLC v. RF Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tenaha Licensing, LLC
Defendant: RF Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00402
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (voc)
July 3, 2019 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (voc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Tenaha Licensing, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 13, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (voc)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In light of the parties' notice of settlement #17 , the June 18, 2019 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference is moved to July 26, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/13/2019. (voc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Tenaha Licensing, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified on 6/11/2019. (lak)
June 11, 2019 Telephone Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 6/18/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendant RFT's motion for an extension #15 is granted. The June 18, 2019 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference will proceed as scheduled. RF Technologies, Inc. answer due 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/20/2019. (voc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant RF Technologies, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Schlicht, Jane)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant RF Technologies, Inc. (Schlicht, Jane)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Jane Carolyn Schlicht for Defendant RF Technologies, Inc (Schlicht, Jane) Modified on 5/20/2019. (lak)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Isaac Rabicoff for Plaintiff Tenaha Licensing, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
May 16, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
May 16, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
May 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-00570. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (kwf)
May 16, 2019 Case transferred electronically to the Western District of Wisconsin. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER To Transfer Venue to the Western District of Wisconsin granting #8 Agreed Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/16/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Joint PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Wisconsin re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Wisconsin by Tenaha Licensing LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Remark: Counsel should file a proposed order for D.I. #8 . (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Wisconsin - filed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jane C. Schlicht for RF Technologies, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Ricardo J. Bonilla, Theresa M. Dawson, Andria Rae Crisler, and Neil J. McNabnay for RF Technologies, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla, Andria Rae Crisler, Theresa M. Dawson and Jane C. Schlicht filed by RF Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/18/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla, Andria Rae Crisler, Theresa M. Dawson and Jane C. Schlicht - filed by RF Technologies, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to May 22, 2019 filed by RF Technologies, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: RF Technologies, Inc. answer due 5/22/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/17/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to May 22, 2019 - filed by RF Technologies, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00568-CFC, 1:19-cv-00569-CFC, 1:19-cv-00570-CFC (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. RF Technologies, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Devlin, Timothy) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to RF Technologies, Inc. on 3/26/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 8,238,869 B2. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against RF Technologies, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2604283.) - filed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenaha Licensing LLC v. RF Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenaha Licensing, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RF Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Douglas Anderson
Represented By: Andria Rae Crisler
Represented By: Jane Carolyn Schlicht
Represented By: Neil Joseph McNabnay
Represented By: Ricardo Bonilla
Represented By: Theresa Marie Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?