Aboloma, Osita v. Vembu, Rajan et al

Plaintiff: Osita Aboloma
Defendant: John Ifediora, Jeff Wagner, U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Rajan Vembu
Case Number: 3:2019cv00418
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 Amended ANSWER by Defendant John Ifediora. (Ifediora, John),(ps)
July 16, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jef),(ps)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Osita Aboloma by Plaintiff Osita Aboloma. (Wagner, Jeff)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Kravit, Stephen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendants U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Rajan Vembu. (Kravit, Stephen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant John Ifediora. (Ifediora, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Returned Executed. John Ifediora served on 6/15/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Stroebel, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Executed. Jeff Wagner served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Stroebel, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint. Rajan Vembu and U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC's answer due 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/27/2019. (kwf)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint by Defendants U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Rajan Vembu. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Kravit, Stephen) Modified on 6/27/2019. (lak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Aaron H. Aizenberg for Defendants U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Rajan Vembu. (Aizenberg, Aaron)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen E. Kravit for Defendants U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Rajan Vembu. (Kravit, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint as directed by the court to include additional allegations regarding subject matter jurisdiction. The court is persuaded that plaintiff has now adequately alleged at the pleading stage that there is complete diversity of citizenship between plaintiff and defendants and the amount in controversy is greater than $75,000, so the court may exercise jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/17/2019. (kwf)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Good cause having been shown, plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to serve the amended complaint #7 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/14/2019. (kwf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (lak)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed. Rajan Vembu served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (lak)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Osita Aboloma. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 6/20/2019. (Stroebel, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Osita Aboloma. (Stroebel, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Disregard. Modified on 6/14/2019. (lak)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Disregard. Modified on 6/14/2019. (lak)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity of Citizenship due 6/13/2019. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/30/2019. (voc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rajan Vembu, Jeff Wagner, John Ifediora, and U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (kwf)
May 22, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
May 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2470707.), filed by Osita Aboloma, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Rajan Vembu, #2 Summons - John Ifediora, #3 Summons - Jeff Wagner, #4 Summons - USFP LLC, #5 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stroebel, Christopher) Modified on 5/22/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aboloma, Osita v. Vembu, Rajan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ifediora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Foods & Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Stephen E. Kravit
Represented By: Aaron H. Aizenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajan Vembu
Represented By: Stephen E. Kravit
Represented By: Aaron H. Aizenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osita Aboloma
Represented By: Christopher J. Stroebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?