Gould, Peter v. Lee Enterprises, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Peter Gould
Defendant: Lee Enterprises, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00450
Filed: June 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by James Alan Friedman for Defendant Lee Enterprises, Incorporated. (Friedman, James)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Lee Enterprises, Incorporated. (Gregor, Jennifer)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Lee Enterprises, Incorporated. (Gregor, Jennifer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (Incomplete.) (voc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lee Enterprises, Incorporated. (voc)
June 3, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
June 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
June 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Enterprises, Incorporated, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2476972.), filed by Peter Gould, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Photograph, #2 Exhibit B - The Infringing Article, #3 Summons (Missing case number.), #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form (Incomplete.)) (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 6/3/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould, Peter v. Lee Enterprises, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Gould
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Enterprises, Incorporated
Represented By: James Alan Friedman
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Gregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?