Erdmann, Charles v. Williams, Louis et al
Plaintiff: Charles Erdmann
Defendant: Louis Williams, II, Melissa Laufenberg, Kwame Gyasi, Robert King, Stacy Ranquette, Jason Stone, Penny Perry and Jan Cole
Case Number: 3:2019cv00457
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Change of Address by Plaintiff Charles Erdmann. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Amended Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Changed plaintiff Charles Erdmann's address to FCI Hazelton re: Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #7 Order. (jef),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Partial Filing fee received: $ 34.95, receipt number 34690034734. (jef),(ps)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 34.95 assessed due by 6/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/4/2019. (rks),(ps)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Support of #4 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Charles Erdmann. (rks),(ps)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Charles Erdmann filed by Plaintiff Charles Erdmann re: #4 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. (rks),(ps)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Charles Erdmann. (rks),(ps)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Charles Erdmann. (Attachments: #1 Authorization for Withdrawal of Funds, #2 IPP Calculation) (rks),(ps)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charles Erdmann. (rks),(ps)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Erdmann. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope) (rks),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erdmann, Charles v. Williams, Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Williams, II
Represented By: David Daly Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Laufenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwame Gyasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Ranquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Erdmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?