Fagan, Robert et al v. Superior Refinery Co., LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Fagan and Shawn Hagenah
Defendant: Superior Refinery Co., LLC and Husky Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00462
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Superior Refinery Co., LLC. Superior Refinery Co., LLC waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Balmer, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Superior Refinery Co., LLC. (jls)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiffs have filed an amended complaint (dkt. #5 ) as directed by the court to include additional allegations regarding subject matter jurisdiction. The court is persuaded that plaintiffs have now adequately alleged at the pleading stage that there is complete diversity of citizenship between plaintiffs and defendant Superior Refinery Co., LLC, and the amount in controversy is greater than $75,000, so the court may exercise jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. In its amended complaint, plaintiffs do not include any claims against defendant Husky Energy, Inc. Because Husky Energy, Inc., has not yet answered the complaint, all claims against defendant Husky Energy, Inc., are DISMISSED, and the clerk's office is directed to terminate it as a party. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/17/2019. (jls)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Robert Fagan, Shawn Hagenah. (Balmer, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Superior Refinery Co., LLC, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Balmer, James)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity of Citizenship due 6/24/2019. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/10/2019. (voc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Husky Energy, Inc., Superior Refinery Co., LLC. (voc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiffs Robert Fagan, Shawn Hagenah. (Balmer, James) Modified on 6/11/2019: The address of both defendants is missing. (lak)
June 6, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
June 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2479631.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Balmer, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fagan, Robert et al v. Superior Refinery Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Refinery Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husky Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fagan
Represented By: James Walter Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Hagenah
Represented By: James Walter Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?