Hoskins, Michael v. Mahoney et al
Plaintiff: Michael S. Hoskins
Defendant: Officer John Doe, Officer Adderton and Officer Mahoney
Not Yet Classified: WCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00480
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Clerk's office annotation: Case terminated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). (jef),(ps)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to dismiss with prejudice by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (jef),(ps)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion to waive the $1.42 initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff may have until 7/24/2019 to submit the $1.42 initial partial payment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/27/2019. (nln),(ps)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Waive the Initial Partial Filing Fee by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (Attachments: #1 Copy of dkt. 3 in 19-cv-362-jdp Order assessing an Initial Partial Payment of $2.01) (rks),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.42 due 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/14/2019. (nln),(ps)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (nln),(ps)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (nln),(ps)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mahoney, John Doe, Adderton, filed by Michael S. Hoskins. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoskins, Michael v. Mahoney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Adderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Mahoney
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?