Hoskins, Michael v. Moon, T. et al
Plaintiff: Michael S. Hoskins
Defendant: Brian Foster and T. Moon
Not Yet Classified: WCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00495
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Clerk's office annotation: Case terminated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). (jef),(ps)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to dismiss with prejudice by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (jef),(ps)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff Michael Hoskins' motion for extension of time to submit the $1.42 initial partial payment of the $350.00 filing fee is GRANTED. Plaintiff may have until July 31, 2019 to submit the $1.42 initial partial payment. If plaintiff does not have enough money to make the initial partial payment from plaintiff's regular account, plaintiff should arrange with prison authorities to pay the remainder from plaintiff's release account. If by July 31 plaintiff fails to make the initial partial payment or show cause for his failure to do so, plaintiff will be held to have withdrawn this case voluntarily and the case will be closed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/9/2019. (nln),(ps)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Partial Filing Fee, by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (nln),(ps)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Add Supporting Documents to the Complaint, by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (Attachments: #1 ICE Return Letters, Inmate Complaint) (nln),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.42 due 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/14/2019. (nln),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (nln),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (nln),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Foster, T. Moon, filed by Michael S. Hoskins. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoskins, Michael v. Moon, T. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foster
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?