Ross, John v. Marske, Matthew et al
Plaintiff: John Lewis Ross, Jr.
Defendant: Matthew Marske, Daniel F. Sullivan and C. Kirby
Case Number: 3:2019cv00497
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Office response to #7 Letter from plaintiff regarding initial partial payment. (rks),(ps)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from plaintiff regarding initial partial payment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Warden PLRA Letter. (rks),(ps)
July 8, 2019 Partial Filing fee received : $22.05, receipt number 34690034867. (rks),(ps)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Letter regarding filing fee from John Lewis Ross, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $22.05 assessed due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/14/2019. (rks),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff John Lewis Ross, Jr. (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (rks),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Lewis Ross, Jr. (rks),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Lewis Ross, Jr. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross, John v. Marske, Matthew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Marske
Represented By: David Daly Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel F. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lewis Ross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?