Hoskins, Michael v. Burn et al
Plaintiff: Michael S. Hoskins
Defendant: Lt. Burn, Kordell Bonslater, John Doe, Sgt. Schneider and Warden Foster
Not Yet Classified: WCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00498
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Clerk's office annotation: Case terminated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). (jef),(ps)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to dismiss with prejudice by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (jef),(ps)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Letter addressed to Capt. Westra dated 7/6/19 (marked as Exhibit 5), filed by Michael S. Hoskins. (nln),(ps)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendants have responded to plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction in which he alleges that defendants are failing to protect him from another prisoner who attacked him. In their response, defendants say that the other prisoner was moved to a different cell and that plaintiff and the other prisoner do not share the same food service or recreation times, so they should not have contact with each other going forward. Defendants also say that plaintiff can file a formal request (a "Special Placement Need") to be separated from the other prisoner if plaintiff wants a more permanent solution. Because plaintiff appears to be out of immediate danger now, his motion for a preliminary injunction, Dkt. #4 , is DENIED. If plaintiff believes that he needs additional protection, he may file a new motion, but only after he follows the procedures available in the prison, such as a Special Placement Need request. See Farmer v. Brennan, 511 U.S. 825, 847 (1994) (a court deciding whether to grant an injunction may consider whether the plaintiff has taken advantage of other available procedures). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/3/2019. (jef),(ps)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration of Linda Schneider filed by Defendants Burn, Foster, Schneider re: #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 102 - IR 379650, #2 Exhibit 103 - IR 380322) (Flugaur, Brandon),(ps)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Declaration of Brian Foster filed by Defendants Burn, Foster, Schneider re: #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 100 - Hoskins Bed Assignments, #2 Exhibit 101 - Bonslater Bed Assignments) (Flugaur, Brandon),(ps)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Burn, Foster, Schneider re: #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael S. Hoskins (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Flugaur, Brandon),(ps)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit, with respect to the defendants the Wisconsin Department of Justice has accepted service for, plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Department. (nln),(ps)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Burn, Foster, Schneider. Service not accepted on behalf of John Doe Supervisor. (Flugaur, Brandon),(ps)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon Flugaur for Defendants Burn, Foster, Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Flugaur, Brandon),(ps)
June 26, 2019 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #4 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Brief in Opposition from Defendants represented by Wisconsin Department of Justice due 7/2/2019. (rks),(ps)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Burn, John Doe, Foster, Schneider. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Kordell Bonslater. The Wisconsin Department of Justice may have until June 28, 2019, to inform the court whether it intends to accept service for any of the defendants. If the department accepts service for any defendants, those defendants may have until July 2, 2019, to respond to Hoskins's request for injunctive relief. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/26/2019. (rks),(ps)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Emergency Injunction by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (nln),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.42 due 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/14/2019. (nln),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Michael S. Hoskins. (nln),(ps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Burn, John Doe, Schneider, Kordell Bonslater, filed by Michael S. Hoskins. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoskins, Michael v. Burn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Burn
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kordell Bonslater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Schneider
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Foster
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?