Salemme-Ortiz, Alejandrina et al v. Janesville Janitor Service & Industrial Supply, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alejandrina Isabel Salemme-Ortiz and Pedro Ortiz
Defendant: Janesville Janitor Service & Industrial Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00507
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zoeller, David)
August 8, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
August 7, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 8/16/2019. (lak)
July 24, 2019 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant Janesville Janitor Service & Industrial Supply, Inc. (Bolton, Richard)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Richard L. Bolton for Defendant Janesville Janitor Service & Industrial Supply, Inc. (Bolton, Richard)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. (Zoeller, David) Modified on 7/2/2019. (lak)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Janesville Janitor Service & Industrial Supply, Inc. (arw)
June 19, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
June 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janesville Janitor Service & Industrial Supply, Inc., (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2486727) filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Salemme-Ortiz Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B - Ortiz Consent Form, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Zoeller, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salemme-Ortiz, Alejandrina et al v. Janesville Janitor Service & Industrial Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janesville Janitor Service & Industrial Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandrina Isabel Salemme-Ortiz
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Madden
Represented By: David C. Zoeller
Represented By: Vanessa Ann Kuettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Ortiz
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Madden
Represented By: David C. Zoeller
Represented By: Vanessa Ann Kuettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?