Higgenbottom, Delante v. Hepp, Randall et al
Plaintiff: Delante Higgenbottom
Defendant: Cathy Jess, Marc W. Clements, Gary Hamblin, Candace Whitman, Randall Hepp and Jon Litscher
Case Number: 3:2019cv00509
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Jon Litscher, Cathy Jess, Candace Whitman, Marc W. Clements, Randall Hepp, Gary Hamblin. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Following service and defendants' answer, this case is STAYED pending resolution of Stapleton v. Hepp, 16-cv-406-jdp (W.D. Wis.). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/31/2019. (rks),(ps)
July 26, 2019 Filing fees received ($349.84 and $0.16): $ 350, receipt numbers 34690034997 and 34690034998 (jef),(ps)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff Delante Higgenbottom's Initial partial filing fee due 8/12/2019. If plaintiff does not have enough money to make the initial partial payment from plaintiff's regular account, plaintiff should arrange with authorities to pay the remainder from plaintiff's release account. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/15/2019. (jef),(ps)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Delante Higgenbottom. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 41.79 assessed due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/20/2019. (rks),(ps)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Delante Higgenbottom. (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (rks),(ps)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Delante Higgenbottom. (rks),(ps)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of letter addressed to attorneys Lawhorn, Edwards, and Kinne by Plaintiff Delante Higgenbottom. (rks),(ps)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Delante Higgenbottom. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgenbottom, Delante v. Hepp, Randall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc W. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hamblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Hepp
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Litscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delante Higgenbottom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?