Channing v. Community Living Alliance

Plaintiff: Katherine Channing
Defendant: Community Living Alliance and Fiscal Assistance Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00526
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Community Living Alliance, Fiscal Assistance Inc, filed by Katherine Channing. (Cueller, Amy)
June 26, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
June 26, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00416. Original file, transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
June 26, 2019 Case Electronically Transmitted to the USDC Western District of Wisconsin on 06/25/2019. (bx) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/25/2019 APPROVING #16 stipulation to transfer venue. Clerk of Court to transfer case to Western District of Wisconsin. (cc: all counsel)(cb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION To Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin by Community Living Alliance. (Papka, Craig) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Channing. Fiscal Assistance Inc served on 6/11/2019. (Cueller, Amy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
June 6, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #14 Brief in Support of Motion filed by Community Living Alliance; The affidavit attached to this document should have been filed separately. Additionally, the description of the attachment contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by Community Living Alliance re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Craig Papka in Support of Defendant Community Living Alliance's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a))(Papka, Craig) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Community Living Alliance. (Papka, Craig). Added MOTION to Change Venue on 6/6/2019 (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Barry Hanneman on behalf of Community Living Alliance. Attorney(s) appearing: Ann Barry Hanneman (Hanneman, Ann) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to Fiscal Assistance Inc. (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Katherine Channing (Cueller, Amy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Community Living Alliance, Fiscal Assistance, Inc. filed by Katherine Channing.(Cueller, Amy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/9/2019 re #8 Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on June 5, 2019. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO Extend Defendant's Deadline to File an Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Community Living Alliance (Papka, Craig) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Channing. Community Living Alliance served on 4/11/2019. (Cueller, Amy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/16/2019 re #5 Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on May 22, 2019. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Community Living Alliance. (Papka, Craig) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig T Papka on behalf of Community Living Alliance. Attorney(s) appearing: Craig T. Papka (Papka, Craig) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Katherine Channing. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cueller, Amy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to Community Living Alliance. (blr) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Katherine Channing (Cueller, Amy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not saved properly (fillable format) and cannot be issued electronically at this time. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. (blr) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
March 21, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Community Living Alliance by Katherine Channing. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3058862) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cueller, Amy) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 6/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Channing v. Community Living Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Channing
Represented By: Amy L. Cueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Living Alliance
Represented By: Ann Barry Hanneman
Represented By: Craig T Papka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiscal Assistance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?