Tzakis, Danny et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Diane Tzakis and Danny A. Tzakis
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00545
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Michael J. Blakely, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Michael J. Blakely, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2525256.) by Plaintiffs Danny A. Tzakis, Diane Tzakis. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Blakely, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Van Dyke, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by David C. Van Dyke for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Van Dyke, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Modl, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (jat)
July 8, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
July 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2495941.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Modl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tzakis, Danny et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Tzakis
Represented By: Michael J. Modl
Represented By: Michael J Blakely, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny A. Tzakis
Represented By: Michael J. Modl
Represented By: Michael J Blakely, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?