Stelzer, Brigitte v. Industrial Media, LLC - A Thomasnet - Rich Media Partnership Enterprise

Plaintiff: Brigitte Stelzer
Defendant: Rich Media Group, LLC and Industrial Media, LLC - A Thomasnet - Rich Media Partnership Enterprise
Case Number: 3:2019cv00547
Filed: July 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Industrial Media, LLC - A Thomasnet - Rich Media Partnership Enterprise. (Erlandson, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant Industrial Media, LLC - A Thomasnet - Rich Media Partnership Enterprise. (Erlandson, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew W. Erlandson for Defendant Industrial Media, LLC - A Thomasnet - Rich Media Partnership Enterprise. (Erlandson, Andrew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Industrial Media, LLC - A Thomasnet - Rich Media Partnership Enterprise, filed by Brigitte Stelzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Photographs, #2 Exhibit B - New York Post Article featuring authorized use of Plaintiff's Photographs, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant's Infringing Article featuring unauthorized use of Plaintiff's Photographs) (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Disregard. See #7 . Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 2, 2019 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant Rich Media Group, LLC. (Erlandson, Andrew) Modified on 7/31/2019: Dated 2018. (lak)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew W. Erlandson for Defendant Rich Media Group, LLC. (Erlandson, Andrew)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (arw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rich Media Group, LLC. (arw)
July 8, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
July 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
July 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rich Media Group, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2496314) filed by Brigitte Stelzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Photograph, #2 Exhibit B - Original NY Post Article, #3 Exhibit C - Infringing Article, #4 Summons, #5 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stelzer, Brigitte v. Industrial Media, LLC - A Thomasnet - Rich Media Partnership Enterprise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigitte Stelzer
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Erlandson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Media, LLC - A Thomasnet - Rich Media Partnership Enterprise
Represented By: Andrew W. Erlandson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?