Edgewood College, Inc. v. Hafner, Dedra et al
Plaintiff: Edgewood College, Inc.
Defendant: Dedra Hafner and Innovations Now LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00552
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendants Dedra Hafner, Innovations Now LLC answer due 9/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/27/2019. (arw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Defendants Dedra Hafner, Innovations Now LLC. (Palmersheim, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin J. Palmersheim for Defendants Dedra Hafner, Innovations Now LLC. (Palmersheim, Kevin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Innovations Now LLC served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Brunner, Shane)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Dedra Hafner served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Brunner, Shane)
July 10, 2019 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark at their earliest convenience. (voc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dedra Hafner, Innovations Now LLC, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Innovations Now LLC) (voc)
July 9, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
July 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Edgewood College, Inc. (Brunner, Shane)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2497131.), filed by Edgewood College, Inc., (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Dedra Hafner, #3 Summons - Innovations Now LLC) (Brunner, Shane) Modified on 7/8/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgewood College, Inc. v. Hafner, Dedra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dedra Hafner
Represented By: Kevin J. Palmersheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovations Now LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Palmersheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgewood College, Inc.
Represented By: Shane A. Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?