Trinwith, Jeffery v. Frazier, Susan et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery M Trinwith
Defendant: Susan Frazier, Paul David, Susan Courtney and Moniqe Fox
Case Number: 3:2019cv00558
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jeffery M Trinwith. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's letter to Judge re intermittent explosive disorder, #2 Plaintiff's Fax Correspondence to Carmen Ramo, ThedaCare Waupaca Clinic, #3 ThedaCare Physicians-Waupaca Clinic to Julleen Olson dated 12/20/16, #4 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Supplement to #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffery M Trinwith. (jef),(ps)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Julleen Olson filed by Plaintiff Jeffery M Trinwith. (jef),(ps)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Complaint Supplement by Plaintiff Jeffery M Trinwith. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Signed copy of #4 Letter Supplement to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Copy of #5 Clerk's Office Letter with plaintiff's signature, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's office returning #4 letter supplement to plaintiff for his signature. (nln),(ps)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Letter Supplement to #1 Complaint (unsigned) filed by Jeffery M Trinwith. See dkt. #6 for signed copy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/10/2019. (rks),(ps)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffery M Trinwith. (Attachments: #1 Letter from the Supreme Court of Wisconsin Office of Lawyer Regulation) (rks)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffery M Trinwith. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinwith, Jeffery v. Frazier, Susan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery M Trinwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moniqe Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?